WA SB5180 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - First reading, referred to Public Safety.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Vacating certain convictions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vacating certain convictions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-26HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety.
2021-02-24SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-02-24SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-24SenateFloor amendment
2021-02-24Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-17SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-05SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-04SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-04SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-02-01SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM.
2021-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
994aNew CodeSee Bill Text
994a030Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
994a640Amended CodeSee Bill Text
996New CodeSee Bill Text
996060Amended CodeSee Bill Text
996070Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5180&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5180.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5180-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5180-S.E.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5180-S%20AMS%20DHIN%20S1217.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5180%20SBA%20LAW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5180%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5180%20SBR%20LAW%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5180-S.E%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123376&actionText=LAW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28451&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123376&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-24-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5180&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback