WA SB5180 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the armed forces exceptions for giving notice of termination of a tenancy.
Title
Concerning the armed forces exceptions for giving notice of termination of a tenancy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | FIET - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1138 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5180&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5180.pdf |