WA SB5180 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 1/1/2017*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 1/1/2017*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modernizing life insurance reserve requirements.
Title
Modernizing life insurance reserve requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Benton [R] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] |
Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2017*. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Chapter 142, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2016-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-03 | House | BFS - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:30 AM. |
2016-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-07-10 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-07-02 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Placed on third reading. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Placed on third reading. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-03-17 | House | BFS - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | FI - Majority; do pass. |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1076 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.