WA SB5178 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the criminal justice treatment account.
Title
Concerning the criminal justice treatment account.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing . |
Same As/Similar To
HB1598 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5178&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5178.pdf |