WA SB5177 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a global Asia institute within the Henry M. Jackson School of International Studies.
Title
Creating a global Asia institute within the Henry M. Jackson School of International Studies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-05-12 | Chapter 466, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-12 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-23 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-19 | President signed. | |
2009-04-18 | Passed final passage; yeas, 43; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 6. | |
2009-04-18 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2009-04-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-07 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-07 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-26 | APPE - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-26 | APPE - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Education Appropriations at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to Education Appropriations. | |
2009-03-20 | HE - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-20 | HE - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-20 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-11 | First reading, referred to Higher Education. | |
2009-03-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 8. | |
2009-03-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-09 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | HEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-20 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-15 | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |