WA SB5175 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the process for prevailing parties to recover judgments in small claims court.
Title
Modifying the process for prevailing parties to recover judgments in small claims court.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1196 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5175&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5175.pdf |