WA SB5170 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning funding and expenditures for legislative organizations by legislators who serve as elected leaders of those organizations.
Title
Concerning funding and expenditures for legislative organizations by legislators who serve as elected leaders of those organizations.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Jeff Wilson [R] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 91, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-03-22 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | SGE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 52 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 52 | 150 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |