WA SB5169 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-15 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning provider reimbursement for personal protective equipment during the state of emergency related to COVID-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning provider reimbursement for personal protective equipment during the state of emergency related to COVID-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2021-02-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-10Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-01-29SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-01-29SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-01-29SenateHLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-29SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-12SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4843New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5169&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5169.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5169-S.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5169%20SBA%20HLTC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5169%20SBR%20HLTC%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5169%20SBR%20HLTC%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5169-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123356&actionText=HLTC%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28406&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123356&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-10-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5169&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback