WA SB5164 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resentencing of individuals sentenced as a persistent offender due to a robbery in the second degree conviction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resentencing of individuals sentenced as a persistent offender due to a robbery in the second degree conviction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-05SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-04SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-04SenateLAW - Majority; do pass.
2021-02-04SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-02-01SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM.
2021-01-12SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback