WA SB5156 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date 5/4/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the farm internship program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding the farm internship program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass with amendment(s) by Labor & Workplace Standards (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-04SenateEffective date 5/4/2023.
2023-05-04SenateChapter 269, 2023 Laws.
2023-05-04SenateGovernor signed.
2023-04-20SenateDelivered to Governor.
2023-04-20HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-04-18SenatePresident signed.
2023-04-14SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2023-04-14SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2023-04-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2023-04-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-04-12HouseCommittee amendment adopted and floor amendment
2023-04-12HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2023-03-29HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2023-03-28HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2023-03-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM.
2023-03-24HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM.
2023-03-17HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM.
2023-01-27HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
2023-01-25SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2023-01-25SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-01-25Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2023-01-19SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2023-01-18SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2023-01-17SenateLC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-01-17SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM.
2023-01-16SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM.
2023-01-09SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2023-01-05SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4912471Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5156&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5156.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5156-S.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Passed%20Legislature/5156-S.PL.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Session%20Laws/Senate/5156-S.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/5156-S%20AMH%20LAWS%20H1812.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/5156-S%20AMH%20CONN%20TANG%20111.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/5156-S%20AMH%20ENGR%20H1812.E.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5156%20SBA%20LC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5156%20SBR%20LC%20TA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5156%20SBR%20LC%20OC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5156-S%20SBR%20APS%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5156-S%20HBA%20LAWS%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5156-S%20HBR%20LAWS%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5156-S%20SBR%20HA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5156-S%20SBR%20FBR%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5156-S%20HBR%20APH%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=65488
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=65861
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=127147&actionText=LC%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30285&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=127147&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=01-25-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5156&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=127147&actionText=LAWS%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29%20by%20Labor%20%26amp%3B%20Workplace%20Standards.&mId=31159&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=127147&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5156&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=127147&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-14-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5156&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback