WA SB5155 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning prejudgment interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning prejudgment interest.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-22SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-22SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-22SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:30 AM.
2021-02-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2021-02-11SenateOn motion, referred to Ways & Means.
2021-02-11SenateRules suspended.
2021-02-05SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-04SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-04SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-12SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
456110Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5155&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5155.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5155-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5155-S2.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5155%20SBA%20LAW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5155%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5155%20SBR%20LAW%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5155%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5155%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5155%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123331&actionText=LAW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28451&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123331&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28693&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback