WA SB5153 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Financial Institutions & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Financial Institutions & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring proof of financial responsibility before the issuance of vehicle registrations.
Title
Requiring proof of financial responsibility before the issuance of vehicle registrations.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | And refer to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5153&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5153.pdf |