WA SB5152 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Enhancing data stewardship and privacy protections for vehicle and driver data.
Title
Enhancing data stewardship and privacy protections for vehicle and driver data.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] |
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Ron Muzzall [R] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 93, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 76; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-29 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2021-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Subjects
BOATS AND BOATING
DRIVERS AND DRIVERS' LICENSES
LICENSING, DEPARTMENT
MOTOR VEHICLES
RECORDS
TRANSPORTATION
DRIVERS AND DRIVERS' LICENSES
LICENSING, DEPARTMENT
MOTOR VEHICLES
RECORDS
TRANSPORTATION
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
46 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
46 | 12 | 630 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 12 | 635 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 12 | 640 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 52 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |