WA SB5149 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Delivered to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Monitoring of domestic violence perpetrators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Monitoring of domestic violence perpetrators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-11SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-09SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-09SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2020-03-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-04HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-04HouseFloor amendment
2020-03-03HousePlaced on second reading.
2020-03-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-29HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-29HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-24HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-20HousePS - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-20HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety.
2020-01-31SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2020-01-31SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-01-31Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2020-01-28SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2020-01-24SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-01-23SenateLAW - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-23SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-16SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-15SenateReferred to Law & Justice.
2020-01-14SenateAnd refer to Law & Justice.
2020-01-14SenateWM - Majority; without recommendation.
2020-01-14SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-02-06SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-25SenateOn motion, referred to Ways & Means.
2019-01-24SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-24SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2019-01-11SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5149&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5149.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5149-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5149-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5149-S2.PL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117501&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=01-31-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5149&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117501&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5149&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117501&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-09-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5149&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback