WA SB5149 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning certificates of need appeals process.
Title
Concerning certificates of need appeals process.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] |
Sen. Linda Evans-Parlette [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |