WA SB5148 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-27 - First reading, referred to Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the harassment of election officials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the harassment of election officials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-27HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety
2021-02-25SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-02-25SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-25Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-23SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-12SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-11SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-02-08SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM.
2021-01-12SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9a46020Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5148&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5148.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5148-S.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5148%20SBA%20LAW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5148%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5148%20SBR%20LAW%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5148-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123309&actionText=LAW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28542&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123309&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-25-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5148&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback