WA SB5147 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Exploring alternative school calendars.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exploring alternative school calendars.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-22SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-22SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:30 AM.
2021-02-09SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-01-27SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-01-27SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-01-27SenateEDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-12SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28a630New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5147&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5147.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5147-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5147-S2.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5147%20SBA%20EDU%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5147%20SBR%20EDU%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5147%20SBR%20EDU%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5147%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5147%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5147%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123308&actionText=EDU%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28339&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123308&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28693&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback