WA SB5145 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the prevention of seabed mining of hard minerals.
Title
Concerning the prevention of seabed mining of hard minerals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-11 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Chapter 181, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-24 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
79 | 14 | 300 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
79 | 140 | 190 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
90 | 58 | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |