WA SB5143 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the exemption of property taxes for nonprofit homeownership development.
Title
Concerning the exemption of property taxes for nonprofit homeownership development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Chapter 103, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 43; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2018-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 80; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee amendment |
2018-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-22 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-01-24 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1532 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.