WA SB5140 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting pregnancy and miscarriage-related patient care.
Title
Protecting pregnancy and miscarriage-related patient care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Chapter 235, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-03-24 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-24 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-03-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-17 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-17 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-17 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Subjects
HEALTH AND SAFETY, PUBLIC
HEALTH CARE
HEALTH CARE FACILITIES
HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONS AND PROVIDERS
HOSPITALS
WOMEN
HEALTH CARE
HEALTH CARE FACILITIES
HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONS AND PROVIDERS
HOSPITALS
WOMEN