WA SB5135 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning unlawfully summoning a police officer.
Title
Concerning unlawfully summoning a police officer.
Sponsors
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Chapter 330, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-26 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-10 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |