WA SB5132 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the disclosure of estimated debt service costs.
Title
Concerning the disclosure of estimated debt service costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-14 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2013-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |