WA SB5131 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing provisions concerning marijuana with respect to research licenses, local authority notifications, the retail licensing application process, processor wholesale events, and jurisdictional requirements.
Title
Addressing provisions concerning marijuana with respect to research licenses, local authority notifications, the retail licensing application process, processor wholesale events, and jurisdictional requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Recommended by Conference Committee (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Final Passage as recommended by the Conference Committee (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Final Passage as recommended by the Conference Committee (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Chapter 317, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Notice to reconsider withdrawn. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Notice given to reconsider vote on final passage. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 44; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted. |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 63; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-04-20 | House | Conference committee report adopted. |
2017-04-20 | House | Conference committee report; received 12:56 PM 4/20/2017. |
2017-04-19 | House | Conference committee appointed. Representatives Sawyer, Schmick, Springer. |
2017-04-19 | House | Conference committee request granted. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee appointed. Senators Rivers, Keiser, Baumgartner. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House for conference thereon. |
2017-04-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 74; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee amendment |
2017-04-11 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-04-04 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-04-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-04-04 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-04-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2017-04-03 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-04-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-03-21 | House | COG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | CLS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1857 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Referred to Commerce & Gaming.