WA SB5130 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning employee's rights concerning personnel files and disciplinary actions.
Title
Concerning employee's rights concerning personnel files and disciplinary actions.
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Sen. June Robinson [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | LCTA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:30 AM. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 9:30 AM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |