WA SB5129 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the possession of vapor, vapor products, tobacco, and tobacco products by minors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the possession of vapor, vapor products, tobacco, and tobacco products by minors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2021-03-09SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-01-29SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-01-29SenateHSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-29SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-21SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
2021-01-08SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70155080Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
70155110Amended CodeSee Bill Text
70345140Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
70345160Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5129&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5129.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5129-S.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5129-S%20AMS%20GILD%20S2010.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5129-S%20AMS%20RIVE%20S2032.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5129-S%20AMS%20WAGO%20S1998.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5129%20SBA%20HSRR%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5129%20SBR%20HSRR%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5129%20SBR%20HSRR%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123275&actionText=HSRR%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28400&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback