WA SB5121 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding eligibility for the graduated reentry program.
Title
Expanding eligibility for the graduated reentry program.
Sponsors
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Public Safety (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Public Safety (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Chapter 266, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-04-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-04-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-25 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-25 | House | PS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-08 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-02-03 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 94a | 728 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 94a | 733 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |