WA SB5118 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting successful reentry.
Title
Supporting successful reentry.
Sponsors
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Children, Youth & Families (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Committee on Children, Youth & Families: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Children, Youth & Families (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Committee on Children, Youth & Families: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Chapter 265, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 33; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 31; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-31 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-18 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-18 | House | CYF - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-02 | House | First reading, referred to Children, Youth & Families. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-02-26 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 70a | 200 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 98 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |