WA SB5117 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning rental vouchers to eligible offenders.
Title
Concerning rental vouchers to eligible offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |