WA SB5116 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Designating "The Evergreen State" as the official nickname of the state of Washington.
Title
Designating "The Evergreen State" as the official nickname of the state of Washington.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-17 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-01-22 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-01-22 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-01-22 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-01-20 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-14 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |