WA SB5114 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning safely reopening Washington.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning safely reopening Washington.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-10SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2021-01-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government & Elections.
2021-01-07SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1321 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Subjects


Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback