WA SB5112 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring broadband internet access service providers to provide virtual private network service.
Title
Requiring broadband internet access service providers to provide virtual private network service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 385 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 385 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |