WA SB5108 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning contributions from political committees to other political committees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning contributions from political committees to other political committees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2018-02-26HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-23HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-21HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-21HouseSEIT - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-21HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-13HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology
2018-02-09SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-02-09SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-09SenateFloor amendment
2018-02-09Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-29SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-01-26SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-26SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-01-26SenateSGTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-12SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-08SenateDue to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-01-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-12SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback