WA SB5108 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying the order of candidate names on ballots.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifying the order of candidate names on ballots.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2016-01-11SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-06-28SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-05-29SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-04-29SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-01-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
2015-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Government Operations & State Security.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback