WA SB5104 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a property tax exemption for spouses of military members or first responders killed in the line of duty.
Title
Concerning the creation of a property tax exemption for spouses of military members or first responders killed in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-10 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 11:00 AM. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |