WA SB5098 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning certain reports.
Title
Concerning certain reports.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | SGE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
COURTS
CRIMINAL PROCEDURE
DENTISTS AND DENTISTRY
HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONS AND PROVIDERS
LABOR
LABOR AND INDUSTRIES, DEPARTMENT
RECORDS
CRIMINAL PROCEDURE
DENTISTS AND DENTISTRY
HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONS AND PROVIDERS
LABOR
LABOR AND INDUSTRIES, DEPARTMENT
RECORDS
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 27 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 32 | 040 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
4 | 24 | 250 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 22 | 290 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |