WA SB5098 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing efficiency in child care reporting.
Title
Increasing efficiency in child care reporting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:45 PM. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |