WA SB5097 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing spouses to combine volunteer hours for purposes of receiving a complimentary discover pass.
Title
Allowing spouses to combine volunteer hours for purposes of receiving a complimentary discover pass.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-26 | House | ENVI - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-17 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-05 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2013-04-02 | House | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-25 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-19 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-19 | House | CDHT - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-03-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | NRP - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks . |