WA SB5092 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date 5/18/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date 5/18/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making 2021-2023 fiscal biennium operating appropriations.
Title
Making 2021-2023 fiscal biennium operating appropriations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Recommended by Conference Committee (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-25 - House - House Final Passage as recommended by the Conference Committee (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-25 - House - House Final Passage as recommended by the Conference Committee (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Effective date 5/18/2021. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Chapter 334, 2021 Laws PV. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-25 | Senate | Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted. |
2021-04-25 | House | Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-25 | House | Conference committee report adopted. |
2021-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report; received 1:45 PM 4/24/2021. |
2021-04-24 | House | Signed by Representatives Gregerson, Ormsby; Senators Robinson, Rolfes. |
2021-04-24 | House | Conference committee report; received 1:27 PM 4/24/2021. |
2021-04-22 | House | Conference committee appointed. Representatives Gregerson, Ormsby, Stokesbary. |
2021-04-22 | House | Conference committee request granted. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Conference committee appointed. Senators Rolfes, Wilson, L., Robinson. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House for conference thereon. |
2021-04-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-03 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-04-02 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-04-01 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:00 PM. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1094 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - House Rules "X" file.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 76 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 45 | 230 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 08 | 190 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 155 | 050 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185c | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 320 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 79 | 195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 88 | 058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 99n | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 09 | 520 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 50 | 540 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 305 | 180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
79 | 105 | 150 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
79a | 25 | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
86 | 26 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |