WA SB5091 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - On motion, referred to Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade.
Pending: Senate Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - On motion, referred to Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade.
Pending: Senate Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revised for 2nd Substitute: Creating and expanding tax incentives for the research, development, production, and sale of hydrogen fuel products in Washington state.Original: Creating and expanding tax incentives for the research, development, production, and sale of hydrogen fuel cells in Washington state.
Title
Revised for 2nd Substitute: Creating and expanding tax incentives for the research, development, production, and sale of hydrogen fuel products in Washington state.Original: Creating and expanding tax incentives for the research, development, production, and sale of hydrogen fuel cells in Washington state.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Chris Gildon [R] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | On motion, referred to Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | BFGT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade. |
2022-12-23 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |