WA SB5091 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing expiration dates, obsolete dates, and an outdated statutory reference from the enforcement provisions of the underground utility damage prevention act.
Title
Removing expiration dates, obsolete dates, and an outdated statutory reference from the enforcement provisions of the underground utility damage prevention act.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-14 | House | TED - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-09 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | EET - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Telecommunications at 6:40 PM. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Telecommunications at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1064 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-17 - Effective date 7/23/2017.