WA SB5084 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-14 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-14 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the all payer claims database to improve health care quality and cost transparency by changing certain definitions regarding data, reporting and pricing of products, responsibility of the office and lead organization, and parameters for release of information.
Title
Clarifying the all payer claims database to improve health care quality and cost transparency by changing certain definitions regarding data, reporting and pricing of products, responsibility of the office and lead organization, and parameters for release of information.
Sponsors
Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | Senate | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Chapter 246, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 41; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2015-04-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 82; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-04-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2015-04-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-03-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-03-31 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-12 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2015-03-10 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |