WA SB5083 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the capital budget.
Title
Concerning the capital budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-25 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | First reading, referred to Rules. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-03-30 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1080 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date 5/18/2021**.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28b | 15 | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 15 | 310 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 20 | 725 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 30 | 750 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 35 | 370 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 50 | 360 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 77 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 155 | 050 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 19 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 88d | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |