WA SB5083 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing certain records, documents, proceedings, and published laws of federally recognized Indian tribes to be admitted as evidence in courts of Washington state.
Title
Allowing certain records, documents, proceedings, and published laws of federally recognized Indian tribes to be admitted as evidence in courts of Washington state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Chapter 39, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on third reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-15 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-21 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |