WA SB5080 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Delivered to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing flexibility in the distribution and use of local funds dedicated to facilities used for youth educational programming.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing flexibility in the distribution and use of local funds dedicated to facilities used for youth educational programming.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-10 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-23SenateDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-20HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-15SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-10HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-04-10HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-09HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-03-17HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-03-15HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2021-03-11HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2021-02-18HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations.
2021-02-16SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2021-02-16SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-16Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-12SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-01-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-01-25SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2021-01-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2021-01-06SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8214050Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8232559Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5080&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5080.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5080-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5080-S.PL.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5080%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5080%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5080%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5080-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5080-S%20HBA%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5080-S%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5080-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5080-S%20SBR%20FBR%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123182&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28346&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123182&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-16-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5080&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123182&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28822&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123182&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-10-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5080&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback