WA SB5079 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Enacting the Native American voting rights act of Washington.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacting the Native American voting rights act of Washington.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-03-14SenateChapter 6, 2019 Laws.
2019-03-14SenateGovernor signed.
2019-03-12SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-03-11SenatePresident signed.
2019-03-08SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-08SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-03-05HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-03-05HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-05HouseCommittee amendment
2019-02-22HousePlaced on second reading.
2019-02-20HouseSGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-02-20HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-08HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
2019-02-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-02-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-06SenateFloor amendment
2019-02-06Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-06SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-01-30SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-01-30SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-01-30SenateSGTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-30SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-23SenatePublic hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
2019-01-04SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1339 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-23 - Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5079&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5079.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5079-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5079-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5079-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5079-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117114&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-06-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5079&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117114&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5079&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117114&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-08-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5079&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback