WA SB5078 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Effective date 7/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Effective date 7/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing firearm safety measures to increase public safety.
Title
Addressing firearm safety measures to increase public safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2022. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Chapter 104, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 42; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2022-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-18 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 3:30 PM. |
2022-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2022-02-09 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1164 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 41 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |