WA SB5074 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Scheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM
Pending: Senate Behavioral Health Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Jan 22 @ 10:30 am in Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & L
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing safe station pilot programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing safe station pilot programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-22SenateScheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM
2021-01-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care.
2021-01-13SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2021-01-05SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4105New CodeSee Bill Text
70385New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback