WA SB5073 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Scheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM
Pending: Senate Behavioral Health Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Jan 22 @ 10:30 am in Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & L
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning involuntary commitment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning involuntary commitment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-22SenateScheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM
2021-01-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care.
2021-01-13SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2021-01-05SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
230010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7002230Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7002240Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7105020Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
7105150Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
7105153Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
7105210Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7105240Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7105320Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7105340Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7105425Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7105585Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7105590Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7124035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7134755Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback