WA SB5073 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning recommendations from the joint legislative task force on the use of deadly force in community policing.
Title
Concerning recommendations from the joint legislative task force on the use of deadly force in community policing.
Sponsors
Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. John McCoy [D] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1529 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.