WA SB5073 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning nonsubstantive updates and realignments of the statutory responsibilities of the office of financial management.
Title
Concerning nonsubstantive updates and realignments of the statutory responsibilities of the office of financial management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Placed on third reading. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-04-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-03-31 | House | GGIT - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-26 | House | First reading, referred to General Government & Information Technology |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | GOSS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & State Security. |